There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Honoring Veterans' Families Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide inscriptions for spouses and children on certain headstones and markers furnished by the Secretary.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/01/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
03/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/13/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1532-1533)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/08/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs03/01/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Hearings by

As of 08/25/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1126 - Honoring Veterans' Families Act


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.