There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the West Valley demonstration project, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
12/02/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6790)
08/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-69.
03/05/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2330-2331)
02/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
12/03/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/02/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6790)
08/16/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 171.
08/16/2019SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-69.
07/16/2019SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/09/2019SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy
03/06/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/05/2019-4:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/05/2019-4:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2330-2331)
03/05/2019-4:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1138.
03/05/2019-4:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2330-2332)
03/05/2019-4:23pmHouseMr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/12/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/11/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/11/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/11/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/11/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy02/12/2019 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/06/2019 Referred to
07/16/2019 Markup by
08/16/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-69
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy07/09/2019 Hearings by

As of 12/07/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1138 - To reauthorize the West Valley demonstration project, and for other purposes.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1138. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (08/16/2019)

This bill reauthorizes through FY2026 the West Valley Demonstration Project located in West Valley, New York.

The Government Accountability Office must report to Congress on the volumes, origins, and types of radioactive waste at the West Valley Demonstration Project and the options for disposal of such waste.