There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Rights for Transportation Security Officers Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enhance the security operations of the Transportation Security Administration and stability of the transportation security workforce by applying the personnel system under title 5, United States Code, to employees of the Transportation Security Administration who provide screening of all passengers and property, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
02/11/2019Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2019Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 02/11/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/13/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/13/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/13/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/13/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/13/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/13/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/15/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/15/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/15/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/15/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/15/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 02/19/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 02/19/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/19/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/19/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/19/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/22/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/22/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/25/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/05/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/05/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/05/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 03/05/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/05/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/05/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/05/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 03/05/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/07/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/07/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/07/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/07/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/07/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/12/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/12/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/12/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 03/25/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 03/25/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/25/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 04/03/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/03/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/03/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 04/10/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/10/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/10/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/10/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security02/11/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security03/15/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform02/11/2019 Referred to

As of 04/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1140 - Rights for Transportation Security Officers Act of 2019.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.