There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

African-American Burial Grounds Network Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 54, United States Code, to establish within the National Park Service the African-American Burial Grounds Network, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
05/22/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
03/05/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 02/27/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/27/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/27/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/27/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/04/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/06/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 03/14/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 03/21/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/27/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/27/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/08/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 04/08/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/03/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/03/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/03/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 05/03/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 05/07/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/07/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/07/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/07/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/07/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/07/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/20/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 05/21/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/10/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/13/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/13/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/11/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 07/22/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 07/30/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 09/18/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 09/27/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/27/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/08/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/08/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/08/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/08/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 10/08/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/28/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 12/05/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 12/06/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/06/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/09/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/08/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 01/28/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/13/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands03/05/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1179. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2019)

African-American Burial Grounds Network Act

This bill directs the Department of the Interior to establish the U.S. African-American Burial Grounds Network within the National Park Service (NPS).

In carrying out the network, Interior, among other things, must

  • review existing and new studies and reports to inform consideration of sites for the network;
  • furnish specified technical assistance;
  • develop a program to train states, units of local government, regional governmental bodies, organizations, educational institutions, and private entities to carry out the purposes of this bill; and
  • produce and disseminate educational and training materials related to African-American burial ground identification methods and best practices for caring for artifacts, developing interpretive tours and exhibits, preserving burial ground landscapes, heritage tourism initiatives and sources for grants (e.g., handbooks, maps, interpretive guides, or electronic information).

A burial ground shall only be considered for addition to the network with the property owner's consent and at the request of an individual, landowner, private or nonprofit organization, state or local government, or another entity.