There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Keep Americans Safe Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To regulate large capacity ammunition feeding devices.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/13/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/13/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/13/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 02/13/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 02/14/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/14/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/14/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/25/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/25/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 02/25/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/21/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/27/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/18/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/18/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/01/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/13/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1186. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2019)

Keep Americans Safe Act

This bill establishes a new criminal offense for the import, sale, manufacture, transfer, or possession of a large capacity ammunition feeding device (LCAFD).

The bill does not prohibit certain conduct with respect to an LCAFD, including the following:

  • importation, sale, manufacture, transfer, or possession related to certain law enforcement efforts, or authorized tests or experiments;
  • importation, sale, transfer, or possession related to securing nuclear materials; and
  • possession by a retired law enforcement officer.

The bill permits continued possession of, but prohibits sale or transfer of, a grandfathered LCAFD.

Newly manufactured LCAFDs must display serial number identification and the date of manufacture.

Additionally, the bill allows a state or local government to use Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant Program funds to compensate individuals who surrender an LCAFD under a buy-back program.