There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Jobs for Veterans Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow an increased work opportunity credit with respect to recent veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/13/2019 Referred to

As of 06/16/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1196 - Jobs for Veterans Act of 2019.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1196. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2019)

Jobs for Veterans Act of 2019

This bill allows an increased work opportunity tax credit for employers who hire veterans who have been certified as discharged or released from active duty in the Armed Forces after September 11, 2001, and who begin working for the employer after December 31, 2019, and before January 1, 2024. This increased credit is in addition to any work opportunity tax credit allowed to a veteran with a service-connected disability.