There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Climate Change National Security Strategy Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct Federal departments and agencies to perform certain functions to ensure that climate change-related impacts are fully considered in the development of national security doctrine, policies, and plans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
02/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/13/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/13/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/13/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 02/13/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/13/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/25/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/25/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/25/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/25/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/25/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 02/25/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/25/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/25/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/05/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/05/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 05/07/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/23/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/22/2019

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/13/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change02/14/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services02/13/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs02/13/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology02/13/2019 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent)02/13/2019 Referred to

As of 12/08/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1201 - Climate Change National Security Strategy Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.