There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

American Fisheries Advisory Committee Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

American Fisheries Advisory Committee Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the American Fisheries Advisory Committee to assist in the awarding of fisheries research and development grants, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/04/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-428.
02/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
06/04/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 342.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-428.
09/18/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/18/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/18/2019Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
05/08/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
03/06/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 02/13/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources02/13/2019 Referred to
09/18/2019 Markup by
06/04/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-428
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife03/06/2019 Referred to
05/08/2019 Hearings by
09/18/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1218. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (06/04/2020)

American Fisheries Advisory Committee Act

This bill directs the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to establish the American Fisheries Advisory Committee to advise on an existing grant program to address the needs of fishing communities, optimize economic benefits by building and maintaining sustainable fisheries, and increase opportunities to keep working waterfronts viable.

NOAA must establish six regions within the committee. The committee must consist of members chosen regionally and across sectors of the fishing industry. Additionally, the committee must (1) identify the needs of the fishing community, (2) develop request for proposals for the grant program, (3) review grant applications, and (4) provide NOAA with grant applications for approval.