There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act to facilitate the establishment of additional or expanded public target ranges in certain States.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
05/10/2019Became Public Law No: 116-17.
05/10/2019Signed by President.
05/02/2019Presented to President.
04/30/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2502)
04/29/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3288-3289)
02/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
05/10/2019Became Public Law No: 116-17.
05/10/2019Signed by President.
05/02/2019HousePresented to President.
04/30/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/30/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2502)
04/29/2019-4:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/29/2019-4:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3288-3289)
04/29/2019-4:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1222.
04/29/2019-4:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3288-3290)
04/29/2019-4:32pmHouseMr. Van Drew moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/06/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/14/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/14/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/14/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife03/06/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1222. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (04/29/2019)

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

This bill allows a state to use federal funds to cover a higher percentage of the costs for the construction and expansion of public target ranges. Specifically, a state may use specified federal grant funds to pay up to 90% of such costs (rather than 75%, as under current law). Additionally, amounts provided for these purposes shall remain available for five fiscal years (rather than two, as under current law).