There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Living Donor Protection Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote and protect from discrimination living organ donors.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
02/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (100)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 02/28/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 02/28/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/05/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 03/05/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/05/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/05/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/05/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/05/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/05/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/07/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/07/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/07/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 03/07/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 03/07/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/02/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 04/02/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/04/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/04/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/04/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 04/04/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/04/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/04/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 04/25/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/25/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/25/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 04/25/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 04/25/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/01/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 05/01/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/01/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/01/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/09/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 05/09/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/09/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 05/09/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/09/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 05/09/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 05/23/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 05/23/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/23/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/23/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/23/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/05/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/05/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/05/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/05/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/26/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/26/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/26/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 07/25/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 10/23/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/23/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/23/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/23/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/23/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/23/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 10/23/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/22/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/22/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 08/22/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 08/22/2020
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 08/22/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 08/22/2020
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 08/22/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 08/22/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 09/16/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/16/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/17/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/17/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/22/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 09/22/2020
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 10/01/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 10/13/2020
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 10/13/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/27/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/27/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/10/2020

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/14/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/15/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform02/14/2019 Referred to
Committee on House Administration02/14/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor02/14/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services02/14/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1224. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2019)

Living Donor Protection Act of 2019

This bill prohibits discrimination based on an individual's status as a living organ donor in the offering, issuance, cancellation, coverage, price, or any other condition of a life-insurance policy, disability-insurance policy, or long-term-care insurance policy.

The bill also specifically includes recovery from organ-donation surgery as a serious health condition that entitles covered private-sector and federal civil-service employees to medical leave.

The Department of Health and Human Services must update public-service announcements, websites, and other media regarding live organ donation to educate the public on the benefits of live organ donation and on access to insurance for living organ donors.