There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

HEART Act of 2019
Help Extract Animals from Red Tape Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, with respect to civil forfeitures relating to certain seized animals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/14/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/15/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/15/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 02/15/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/15/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/18/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/18/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/18/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/18/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 03/18/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/18/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/18/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/18/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 03/18/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/18/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/18/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/18/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 03/18/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/18/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/18/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/18/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/18/2019
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/18/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/18/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 03/18/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/18/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/25/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/25/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/25/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/25/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/25/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/04/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/04/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/04/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/10/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 04/10/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/15/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 04/15/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 04/15/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/18/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 05/02/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 05/10/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 05/14/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/17/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/28/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/03/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/12/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 06/12/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 06/27/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/18/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 07/25/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 08/02/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 08/06/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 08/16/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/30/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/19/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/19/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 10/21/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/21/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/14/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1228. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2019)

Help Extract Animals from Red Tape Act of 2019 or the HEART Act of 2019

This bill modifies notice requirements in a civil forfeiture proceeding that involves the seizure of an animal involved in animal fighting.

Specifically, the government must notify interested parties of an animal's seizure within 30 days (currently, 60 days). The notice period may be extended only if a delay is warranted after considering certain factors, including the cost to the government of providing shelter for the animal, the health of the animal and the effect of a delay on its rehabilitation, and any increased risk that a delay could necessitate the euthanasia of the animal.

Additionally, the bill authorizes amounts in the Department of Justice Assets Forfeiture Fund to be used to pay for costs associated with a seized animal, including transportation, shelter, care, veterinary services, and humane euthanasia.