There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Alternative Data for Additional Credit FHA Pilot Program Reauthorization Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

FHA Additional Credit Pilot Program Reauthorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize a pilot program under section 258 of the National Housing Act to establish an automated process for providing additional credit rating information for mortgagors and prospective mortgagors under certain mortgages.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/17/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-663.
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
12/17/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 547.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/17/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-663.
09/20/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 22.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/20/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/19/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/18/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
01/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/12/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services01/03/2019 Referred to
09/20/2019 Markup by
12/17/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-663

No related bill information was received for H.R.123.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.123. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

FHA Alternative Credit Pilot Program Reauthorization Act

This bill reauthorizes a pilot program for an alternative credit rating system for use by mortgage lenders. Specifically, the program provides credit information about borrowers who have insufficient credit histories for purposes of determining their creditworthiness for mortgages insured by the Federal Housing Administration.