There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Equal Dignity for Married Taxpayers Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to clarify that all provisions shall apply to legally married same-sex couples in the same manner as other married couples, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/14/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (85)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/14/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/14/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/14/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/14/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/14/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 02/19/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 02/19/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 02/26/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/26/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 03/12/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 03/21/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 03/26/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 04/01/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 04/01/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/22/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/10/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/10/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/14/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1244. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2019)

Equal Dignity for Married Taxpayers Act of 2019

This bill modifies several tax provisions that refer to married couples to make the provisions equally applicable to legally married same-sex couples.