Text: H.R.1249 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 1249


To prohibit the Secretary of Defense from obligating or expending funds for missiles banned by the INF Treaty.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

February 14, 2019

Ms. Gabbard (for herself, Ms. Omar, Mr. McGovern, and Mr. Pocan) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To prohibit the Secretary of Defense from obligating or expending funds for missiles banned by the INF Treaty.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “INF Treaty Compliance Act of 2019”.

SEC. 2. Statement of policy.

It is the policy of the United States to uphold the Treaty on the Non-Proliferation of Nuclear Weapons, entered into force with respect to the United States on March 5, 1970, which commits the United States as a State Party “to pursue negotiations in good faith on effective measures relating to cessation of the nuclear arms race at an early date and to nuclear disarmament, and on a treaty on general and complete disarmament under strict and effective international control”, including through such measures as the INF Treaty.

SEC. 3. Prohibition on availability of funds for missiles banned by the INF Treaty.

(a) Prohibition.—None of the funds authorized to be appropriated or otherwise made available for the Department of Defense for fiscal year 2020 or any fiscal year thereafter may be obligated or expended for the testing and evaluation, procurement, or fielding of any missile prohibited under the INF Treaty (as if such treaty is in force).

(b) Definitions.—In this Act:

(1) The term “INF Treaty” means the Treaty Between the United States of America and the Union of Soviet Socialist Republics on the Elimination of Their Intermediate-Range and Shorter-Range Missiles, commonly referred to as the “Intermediate-Range Nuclear Forces (INF) Treaty”, signed at Washington December 8, 1987, and entered into force June 1, 1988.