There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Police Training and Independent Review Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for grants for States that require sensitivity training for law enforcement officers of that State and to incentivize States to enact laws requiring the independent investigation and prosecution of the use of deadly force by law enforcement officers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/03/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/08/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/08/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/08/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/08/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/08/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/08/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/08/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/08/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 01/08/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/08/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/11/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 01/14/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/16/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 01/16/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/16/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/16/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/16/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/16/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/22/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/22/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 01/22/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/22/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 01/22/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/28/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/29/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 01/29/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/05/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/05/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 02/06/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 02/11/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/19/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/22/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/04/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/11/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/13/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/20/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/03/2019 Referred to

As of 08/25/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.125 - Police Training and Independent Review Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.125. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

Police Training and Independent Review Act of 2019

This bill authorizes the Department of Justice to award grants to states that do the following: (1) require law enforcement officers to be trained on diversity and sensitivity, and (2) require an independent prosecutor to be appointed to investigate and prosecute an alleged offense involving the use of deadly force by a law enforcement officer that results in a death or injury.