There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 6531 Van Nuys Boulevard in Van Nuys, California, as the "Marilyn Monroe Post Office".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/25/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/14/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/14/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 02/14/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 02/14/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/10/2019
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/12/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 07/12/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/12/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform02/14/2019 Referred to
07/25/2019 Markup by

As of 08/26/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1252 - To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 6531 Van Nuys Boulevard in Van Nuys, California, as the "Marilyn Monroe Post Office".


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1252. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2019)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 6531 Van Nuys Boulevard in Van Nuys, California, as the "Marilyn Monroe Post Office."