There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 13507 Van Nuys Boulevard in Pacoima, California, as the "Ritchie Valens Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/16/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8169)
02/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
10/17/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
10/16/2019-3:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/16/2019-3:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8169)
10/16/2019-3:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1253.
10/16/2019-3:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8169-8170)
10/16/2019-3:07pmHouseMr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/25/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/14/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
02/14/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/14/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 02/14/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 02/14/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/10/2019
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/12/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 07/12/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/12/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform02/14/2019 Referred to
07/25/2019 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/17/2019 Referred to

As of 10/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1253 - To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 13507 Van Nuys Boulevard in Pacoima, California, as the "Ritchie Valens Post Office Building".


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1253. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2019)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 13507 Van Nuys Boulevard in Pacoima, California, as the "Ritchie Valens Post Office Building."