There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Ghost Guns Are Guns Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to require firearm assembly kits to be considered to be firearms.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/14/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (88)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/04/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/05/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/05/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/08/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/28/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/10/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 06/19/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 06/24/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/25/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/26/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/05/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/05/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/09/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/09/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/10/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/16/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 07/16/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/17/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/17/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/17/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/23/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 07/25/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/30/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 07/30/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 08/06/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 08/09/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/09/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/13/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/16/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 08/16/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 08/20/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 08/23/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 08/27/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/27/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/06/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/10/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 09/12/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 09/24/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/24/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/26/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/08/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 11/22/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 11/22/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/08/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/08/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 01/08/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 01/14/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/15/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 01/15/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/15/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 01/15/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 01/17/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 01/17/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 01/24/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 01/24/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/24/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 01/24/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 01/24/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 01/27/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/28/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/30/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 02/10/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/10/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/21/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 02/25/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/25/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/02/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/04/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 03/04/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 04/23/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/14/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1266. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2019)

Ghost Guns Are Guns Act

This bill broadens the definition of "firearm" for purposes of federal firearms laws.

Specifically, it includes as a firearm any combination of parts designed and intended to be used to convert a device into a firearm and from which a firearm may be readily assembled.