There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Vet HP Act
Veterans-Specific Education for Tomorrow's Health Professionals Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Vet HP Act
Veterans-Specific Education for Tomorrow's Health Professionals Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish in the Department of Veterans Affairs a pilot program instituting a clinical observation program for pre-med students preparing to attend medical school.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/05/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2335)
02/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
03/07/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 31.
03/06/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
03/05/2019-5:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/05/2019-5:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2335)
03/05/2019-4:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1271.
03/05/2019-4:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2335-2337)
03/05/2019-4:59pmHouseMr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/01/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/14/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/14/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/14/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 03/05/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 03/05/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 03/05/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/14/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/01/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.