There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Higher Education Dream Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit discrimination in higher education against certain undocumented students on the basis of immigration status, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 02/15/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 02/19/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/19/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/19/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/19/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/19/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/19/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/19/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/19/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/19/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/19/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/19/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 02/19/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/19/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/19/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/19/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/19/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/22/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/22/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/22/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/22/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/22/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/27/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/27/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/27/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/27/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 02/27/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 02/27/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 02/27/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/27/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/27/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 03/08/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/08/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 03/08/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/08/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 03/08/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 03/08/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/08/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/08/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/14/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 03/14/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 03/14/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 03/14/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/14/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor02/15/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary02/15/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship03/25/2019 Referred to

As of 04/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1298 - Higher Education Dream Act of 2019.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.