There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Let It Go Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to provide for a limitation on the time for the use of contributions or donations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/15/2019Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/28/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/21/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 10/08/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Committee on House Administration02/15/2019 Referred to

As of 10/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1308 - Let It Go Act


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1308. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/15/2019)

Let It Go Act

This bill requires individuals to use contributions or donations not later than six years following the most recent federal election in which the individual was a candidate and before the individual becomes a registered lobbyist.

The bill requires remaining contributions or donations to be disposed of within 30 days, first by paying debts or obligations owed in connection with the campaign for that office. Additional remaining funds must be disposed of by (1) returning those contributions or donations to the individuals, entities, or both, who made them; (2) making contributions to a charitable organization; or (3) making transfers to a national, state, or local committee of a political party.