There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Blue Collar to Green Collar Jobs Development Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Department of Energy Organization Act to reauthorize an office within the Department of Energy, to direct the Secretary of Energy to establish and carry out a comprehensive, nationwide energy-related industries jobs program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/22/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
07/17/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/17/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/16/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
05/16/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
04/10/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
02/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/22/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/22/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/22/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/09/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/10/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor02/22/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/22/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy02/25/2019 Referred to
04/10/2019 Hearings by
05/16/2019 Markup by
05/16/2019 Reported by

As of 09/18/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1315 - Blue Collar to Green Collar Jobs Development Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.