There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Librarian of Congress to obtain a stained glass panel depicting the seal of the District of Columbia and install the panel among the stained glass panels depicting the seals of States which overlook the Main Reading Room of the Library of Congress Thomas Jefferson Building.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/16/2019Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-66, Part I.
02/22/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
05/16/2019Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-66, Part I.
02/27/2019Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
02/27/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/27/2019Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
02/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/22/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/22/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/22/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E194-195)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/22/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration02/22/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/22/2019 Referred to
02/27/2019 Markup by
05/16/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-66
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management02/25/2019 Referred to
02/27/2019 Discharged from

As of 10/20/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1318 - To direct the Librarian of Congress to obtain a stained glass panel depicting the seal of the District of Columbia and install the panel among the stained glass panels depicting the seals of States which overlook the Main Reading Room of the Library of Congress Thomas Jefferson Building.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1318. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House, Part I (05/16/2019)

This bill requires the Librarian of Congress, concurrently with the planned renovation and replacement of existing glass panels, to obtain a stained glass panel depicting the seal of the District of Columbia and install it among the panels depicting the seals of states that overlook the Main Reading Room of the Library of Congress Thomas Jefferson Building.