There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Protect and Serve Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to punish criminal offenses targeting law enforcement officers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/22/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/22/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/22/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 02/22/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 02/22/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 02/22/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/28/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/28/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 02/28/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/08/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/08/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/08/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 03/08/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/08/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 03/14/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/21/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 05/02/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/14/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/21/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 09/10/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/24/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 10/15/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 10/15/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 01/07/2020
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/13/2020
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/11/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 02/11/2020
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 02/13/2020
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/21/2020
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/21/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/26/2020
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 02/27/2020
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 02/27/2020
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 03/03/2020
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 03/03/2020
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/03/2020
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 03/03/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 04/23/2020
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 08/21/2020
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 09/04/2020
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 09/11/2020
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/14/2020
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/14/2020
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/14/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/17/2020
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 09/17/2020
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/17/2020
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 09/17/2020
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 09/21/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/21/2020
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/21/2020
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 09/21/2020
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/21/2020
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 09/22/2020
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/22/2020
Rep. Garcia, Mike [R-CA-25] 09/30/2020
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 10/09/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/22/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1325. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/22/2019)

Protect and Serve Act of 2019

This bill establishes a new criminal offense for knowingly assaulting a law enforcement officer causing serious bodily injury (or attempting to do so) in circumstances that affect interstate commerce.

It imposes criminal penalties—a prison term of up to 10 years, a fine, or both—on a violator.