There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

EMPOWER Care Act
Ensuring Medicaid Provides Opportunities for Widespread Equity, Resources, and Care Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Money Follows the Person Demonstration Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/25/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/07/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 03/07/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/07/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/11/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/11/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/11/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/11/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/11/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/11/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/11/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/11/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 03/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/11/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/11/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/11/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/18/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/18/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/26/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 03/26/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/26/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/26/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/26/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/26/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 04/01/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 04/09/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/18/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/29/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 04/29/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 04/29/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/29/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/29/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/01/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/03/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 05/07/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/07/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/07/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 05/14/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/28/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 06/13/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/25/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/27/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 07/09/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/06/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/11/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/11/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/18/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/05/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 01/27/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/25/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1342. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/25/2019)

Ensuring Medicaid Provides Opportunities for Widespread Equity, Resources, and Care Act or the EMPOWER Care Act

This bill extends funding through FY2023 for the Money Follows the Person Rebalancing Demonstration Program and otherwise revises the program. (Under this program, the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services may award grants to state Medicaid programs to assist states in increasing the use of home and community care for long-term care and decreasing the use of institutional care.)