There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Digital GAP Act
Digital Global Access Policy Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Digital GAP Act
Digital Global Access Policy Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote Internet access in developing countries and update foreign policy toward the Internet, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/20/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3970-3972)
02/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/21/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
05/20/2019-4:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/20/2019-4:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3970-3972)
05/20/2019-4:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1359.
05/20/2019-4:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3970-3973)
05/20/2019-4:21pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/09/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/09/2019HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
04/09/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/26/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/26/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/09/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 04/25/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/07/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/26/2019 Referred to
04/09/2019 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations05/21/2019 Referred to

As of 11/28/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1359 - Digital GAP Act


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1359. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (05/20/2019)

Digital Global Access Policy Act of 2019 or the Digital GAP Act

This bill directs the Department of State to advance U.S. policy to promote public and private investments in secure Internet infrastructure and increase Internet access around the world. The U.S. Agency for International Development and the Peace Corps shall also make efforts to advance such policy.

The President shall report to Congress about U.S. efforts to implement the policy, including government efforts to provide technical and regulatory assistance to developing countries and close the gender gap in Internet access.