There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Responsible Additions and Increases to Sustain Employee Health Benefits Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide the opportunity for responsible health savings to all American families.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/26/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 03/11/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/11/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 03/11/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/11/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 03/25/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 04/01/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 04/01/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/08/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/30/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/30/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/24/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/24/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/24/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/24/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/24/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/24/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/24/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/24/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 10/24/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/24/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 11/08/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 11/08/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/08/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 11/08/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 11/08/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 11/22/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 01/15/2020
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 02/25/2020
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/03/2020
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 03/03/2020
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/03/2020
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 03/03/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1366. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/26/2019)

Responsible Additions and Increases to Sustain Employee Health Benefits Act of 2019

This bill modifies the tax exclusion for distributions from health flexible spending arrangements provided to employees under a cafeteria plan to (1) increase the annual limit on employee salary reduction contributions to $5,000, with an additional $500 for each additional employee dependent above two dependents that has not been taken into account by another person for the year; (2) revise the adjustment for inflation after 2020; and (3) allow a carryforward into the next year for unused amounts in such plans.