There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify that it is United States policy to recognize Israel's sovereignty over the Golan Heights.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/28/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/28/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/28/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/06/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/06/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 03/06/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/12/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 03/12/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/12/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 03/12/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/26/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 03/26/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 03/26/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/26/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 03/26/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/26/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/26/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/26/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/26/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/26/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/26/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/26/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 03/26/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/26/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/26/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21] 03/26/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/26/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 03/26/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/26/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 03/26/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/03/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/03/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 04/03/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 04/03/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/03/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/08/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 04/08/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/17/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/17/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 05/17/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 05/17/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 06/25/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/11/2019

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/26/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/26/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade02/26/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology02/26/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture02/26/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research03/15/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1372. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/26/2019)

This bill establishes that it is U.S. policy to recognize Israel's sovereignty over the Golan Heights. References to "Israel" in future acts of Congress relating to appropriations or foreign commerce shall be interpreted to include the Golan Heights.