There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Grand Canyon Centennial Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect, for current and future generations, the watershed, ecosystem, and cultural heritage of the Grand Canyon region in the State of Arizona, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
07/17/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14.
07/17/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/17/2019Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
06/05/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
03/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/26/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (119)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/26/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 02/26/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 02/26/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/21/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 03/21/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/21/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/21/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/21/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/21/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 03/21/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/21/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 04/02/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 04/02/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/03/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/25/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/25/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/25/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/25/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 04/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/25/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/29/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/29/2019
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 04/29/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/29/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/29/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 04/29/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/29/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/02/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/02/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/02/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 05/02/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/02/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 05/07/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/07/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/07/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/07/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 05/07/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/09/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/09/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/09/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 05/09/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 05/16/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/16/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/16/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/16/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 05/22/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/22/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/22/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/22/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 06/03/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/03/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/03/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/03/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/03/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/03/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/03/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/03/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/03/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/03/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/03/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/03/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/03/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/03/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/04/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/04/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/04/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/04/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/04/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 06/04/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/04/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/04/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/04/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 06/04/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/04/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/10/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/10/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/10/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/10/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/11/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/11/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/11/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/18/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/18/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 06/24/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/09/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/09/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/09/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 07/09/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 07/16/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/30/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/16/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 09/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/26/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands03/11/2019 Referred to
06/05/2019 Hearings by
07/17/2019 Discharged from

As of 09/22/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1373 - Grand Canyon Centennial Protection Act


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1373. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/26/2019)

Grand Canyon Centennial Protection Act

This bill withdraws 1,006,545 acres of federal lands in Arizona, including any land or interest in land acquired by the United States after enactment of this bill, from

  • entry, appropriation, and disposal under the public land laws;
  • location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and
  • operation of the mineral leasing and geothermal leasing laws and mineral materials laws.