There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

PAID Act
Provide Accurate Information Directly Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

PAID Act
Provide Accurate Information Directly Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for transparency of Medicare secondary payer reporting information, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/08/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
02/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/09/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
12/08/2020-3:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2020-3:37pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6991-6992)
12/08/2020-3:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1375.
12/08/2020-3:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6991-6993)
12/08/2020-3:27pmHouseMr. Larson (CT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/11/2020HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
03/11/2020HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
02/27/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/26/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/26/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/26/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/26/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (17)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means02/26/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/26/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/26/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/27/2019 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
03/11/2020 Reported by
Senate Finance12/09/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1375. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/08/2020)

Provide Accurate Information Directly Act or the PAID Act

This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to provide, in response to an inquiry from certain non-group health plans (e.g., liability insurers), whether an individual was enrolled in Medicare, Medicare Advantage, or the Medicare prescription drug benefit during the preceding three-year period.

The bill also restores available funding to the Medicare Improvement Fund.