There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mark Takai Atomic Veterans Healthcare Parity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the treatment of veterans who participated in the cleanup of Enewetak Atoll as radiation exposed veterans for purposes of the presumption of service-connection of certain disabilities by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/04/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E235)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (119)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/26/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/26/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/28/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 02/28/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 02/28/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/28/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/28/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 03/04/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 03/07/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/07/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/07/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 03/07/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/18/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/18/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 03/18/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/21/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/21/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/21/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/21/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 03/21/2019
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 03/21/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/21/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/21/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 03/21/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/21/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 03/21/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/21/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/26/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/26/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/28/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 04/08/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 04/08/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/30/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 04/30/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/07/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/07/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 05/07/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/07/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/26/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs03/14/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.