There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Lytton Rancheria Homelands Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Lytton Rancheria Homelands Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Lytton Rancheria Homelands Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To take lands in Sonoma County, California, into trust as part of the reservation of the Lytton Rancheria of California, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/29/2019Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-67.
03/26/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 21 (Roll no. 128).(text: CR H2812-2813)
02/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
07/29/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 166.
07/29/2019SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-67.
06/19/2019SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/27/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
03/26/2019-2:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/26/2019-2:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 21 (Roll no. 128). (text: CR H2812-2813)
03/26/2019-2:13pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2815-2816)
03/26/2019-1:32pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/26/2019-1:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1388.
03/26/2019-1:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2812-2813)
03/26/2019-1:28pmHouseMr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/12/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/27/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/27/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/27/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States03/12/2019 Referred to
Senate Indian Affairs03/27/2019 Referred to
06/19/2019 Markup by
07/29/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-67

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1388. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (03/26/2019)

Lytton Rancheria Homelands Act of 2019

This bill takes into trust for the benefit of the Lytton Rancheria of California certain land owned by the tribe in Sonoma County, California. Land taken into trust shall be part of the tribe's reservation.

Gaming is prohibited on land taken into trust by this bill, and on lands taken into trust for the benefit of the tribe in the future.

The memorandum of agreement entered into by the tribe and the county is not subject to review or approval by the Department of the Interior.