There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Horse Transportation Safety Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to prohibit the transportation of horses in interstate transportation in a motor vehicle containing 2 or more levels stacked on top of one another, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E216)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (131)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/27/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 02/27/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/27/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/05/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 03/05/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/07/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/12/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/27/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/27/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 03/27/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/04/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 04/08/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/12/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/12/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/15/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 04/15/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/22/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/30/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/30/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/01/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 05/02/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 05/08/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 05/08/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/24/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/30/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/30/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/30/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/03/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/03/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/03/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/04/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 06/11/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 06/20/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/26/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/09/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/09/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/11/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/12/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/15/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/15/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/15/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/24/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 08/30/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 08/30/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/10/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/24/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/08/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/16/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 10/17/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/21/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/28/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 11/19/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 11/21/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/09/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/08/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/09/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/09/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 01/09/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/09/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/09/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 01/09/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 01/09/2020
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 01/10/2020
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 01/13/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/13/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 01/15/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 01/16/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 01/16/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 01/16/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/27/2020
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 01/27/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/27/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/28/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 02/03/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 02/03/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/05/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/05/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/07/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/07/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 02/07/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 02/10/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 02/11/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 02/11/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/14/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 02/25/2020
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 02/25/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 03/02/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 03/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/27/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit02/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1400. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/2019)

Horse Transportation Safety Act of 2019

This bill prohibits a person from transporting a horse in interstate commerce in a motor vehicle (except a vehicle operated exclusively on rail or rails) containing two or more levels stacked on top of one another.

The bill prescribes civil penalties for knowing violations of such prohibition.