There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Respect for Peace Corps Volunteers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Peace Corps Act to allow former volunteers and officers and employees to use the seal, emblem, or name of Peace Corps on death announcements and grave stones.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 02/27/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 02/28/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/04/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/04/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/04/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/05/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/05/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/07/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 03/11/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/12/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 03/18/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/21/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 04/08/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 04/08/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/08/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/09/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/10/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/12/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/12/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/12/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/30/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 05/03/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/08/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/15/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/19/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/26/2020
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/04/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/09/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/17/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 04/17/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 05/13/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs02/27/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations03/14/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1411. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/2019)

Respect for Peace Corps Volunteers Act

This bill allows the official seal or emblem of the Peace Corps and the name "Peace Corps" to be used on any death announcement, plaque, grave stone, or other grave marker of a former volunteer, officer, or employee of the Peace Corps.