There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Competitive Health Insurance Reform Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Competitive Health Insurance Reform Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Competitive Health Insurance Reform Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Competitive Health Insurance Reform Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To restore the application of the Federal antitrust laws to the business of health insurance to protect competition and consumers.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-327. (TXT | PDF)
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/01/2021Presented to President.
12/22/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/22/2020Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/21/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
02/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-327. (TXT | PDF)
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/01/2021HousePresented to President.
12/22/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/22/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/22/2020SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7929)
09/22/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/21/2020-1:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2020-1:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4571-4572)
09/21/2020-1:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1418.
09/21/2020-1:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4571-4573)
09/21/2020-1:31pmHouseMs. Scanlon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/08/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/28/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
02/28/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 02/28/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 03/05/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/11/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 03/27/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/29/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 04/29/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/29/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 04/29/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 04/29/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/01/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/01/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/01/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/09/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 05/09/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/10/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/10/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/11/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/25/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/09/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 07/15/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/16/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/04/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/04/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/04/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/08/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/08/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/16/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 10/21/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/30/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 10/31/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/08/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/18/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 12/05/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/11/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 01/24/2020
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 09/11/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/11/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/11/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/28/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law04/08/2019 Referred to
Senate Judiciary09/22/2020 Referred to
12/22/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1418. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-327 (01/13/2021)

Competitive Health Insurance Reform Act of 2020

This bill declares that nothing in the McCarran-Ferguson Act modifies, impairs, or supersedes the operation of antitrust laws with respect to the business of health insurance, including the business of dental insurance. This declaration does not apply to a contract, combination, or conspiracy to (1) collect, compile, or disseminate historical loss data; (2) determine a loss development factor for historical loss data; (3) perform actuarial services if the collaboration does not involve a restraint of trade; or (4) develop or disseminate a standard insurance policy form if adherence to the form is not required.

Prohibitions against unfair methods of competition apply to the business of health insurance without regard to whether the business is for profit.