There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Education Freedom Scholarships and Opportunity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to establish tax credits to encourage individual and corporate taxpayers to contribute to scholarships for elementary and secondary students through eligible scholarship-granting organizations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/28/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (108)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 02/28/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 03/07/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/07/2019
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/07/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 03/07/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/07/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 03/08/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/08/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/14/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 03/14/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/03/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 04/10/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/10/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/10/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 05/09/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/09/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/16/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/04/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 06/05/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/06/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/13/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 06/13/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/13/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/19/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/18/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 07/25/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/13/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/20/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/25/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 09/25/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/16/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 10/18/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 10/22/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 10/22/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/22/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 10/22/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 10/29/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/13/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/13/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/20/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 12/04/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 12/11/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 12/11/2019
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3] 12/18/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/18/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 12/18/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 12/18/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 12/23/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 12/23/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 12/23/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/23/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 12/23/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/08/2020
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 01/08/2020
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 01/17/2020
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 01/17/2020
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/27/2020
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 01/27/2020
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/28/2020
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 01/28/2020
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 01/28/2020
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 01/29/2020
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 01/29/2020
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 01/29/2020
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 02/10/2020
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 02/10/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/28/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor02/28/2019 Referred to

As of 02/16/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1434 - Education Freedom Scholarships and Opportunity Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.