There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Education Freedom Scholarships and Opportunity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to establish tax credits to encourage individual and corporate taxpayers to contribute to scholarships for elementary and secondary students through eligible scholarship-granting organizations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/28/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 02/28/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 03/07/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/07/2019
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/07/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 03/07/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/07/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 03/08/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/08/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/14/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 03/14/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/03/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 04/10/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/10/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/10/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 05/09/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/09/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/16/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/04/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 06/05/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/06/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/13/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 06/13/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/13/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/19/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/18/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 07/25/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/13/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/20/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/25/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 09/25/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/16/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 10/18/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 10/22/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 10/22/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/22/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 10/22/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 10/29/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/13/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/13/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/20/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 12/04/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 12/11/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 12/11/2019
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3] 12/18/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/18/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 12/18/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 12/18/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 12/23/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 12/23/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 12/23/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/23/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 12/23/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/08/2020
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 01/08/2020
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 01/17/2020
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 01/17/2020
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/27/2020
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 01/27/2020
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/28/2020
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 01/28/2020
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 01/28/2020
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 01/29/2020
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 01/29/2020
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 01/29/2020
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 02/10/2020
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 02/10/2020
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 02/21/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/28/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor02/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1434. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/2019)

Education Freedom Scholarships and Opportunity Act

This bill allows individual and corporate taxpayers a tax credit for cash contributions to tax-exempt scholarship-granting organizations for elementary and secondary education expenses. It imposes a cap of $5 billion on the amount of contributions that qualify for a tax credit.

The bill directs the Department of Education, in coordination with the Department of the Treasury, to establish, host, and maintain a web portal that (1) lists all eligible scholarship-granting organizations; (2) enables contributions to such organizations; (3) provides information about the benefits of this bill; and (4) enables a state to submit and update information about its programs and scholarship-granting organizations, including information on student eligibility and allowable educational expenses.