There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Sites Reservoir Project Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to take actions supporting non-Federal investments in water infrastructure improvements in the Sacramento Valley, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/28/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E229)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 03/07/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/11/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/13/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/13/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/25/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 12/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources02/28/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife03/15/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1435.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1435. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/2019)

Sites Reservoir Project Act

This bill directs the Bureau of Reclamation of the Department of the Interior to take certain actions related to federal support for the construction of water infrastructure in California.

Specifically, with respect to the Sites Project (a water storage project in Glenn and Colusa Counties, California), Reclamation shall (1) be the lead federal agency for the purposes of all federal reviews, approvals, or decisions required under federal law to allow either Reclamation or the Sites Project Authority to construct the project; and (2) ensure that all such reviews, approvals, or decisions are completed by January 1, 2022.

Reclamation must complete the final feasibility study evaluating the development of the project and, if the project is determined to be feasible, Reclamation may authorize additional funding and technical support.  Reclamation must also work to facilitate the completion and issuance of the final joint environmental impact statement and report on the project.

Reclamation shall, at the authority's request, enter into a partnership agreement for the authority to provide full project management control for construction of the project or a separable element of the project. Further, Reclamation must advance the project as a non-federal project, and the Department of the Interior must execute a long-term agreement with the authority for the coordination of operations of the Sites project and the Central Valley Project.