There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

COOL OFF Act
Choosing Our Own Lives Over Fast Firearms Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a 3-day waiting period before a person may receive a handgun, with exceptions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/28/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 02/28/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/28/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/04/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 03/05/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/12/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/12/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 03/12/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/12/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/12/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/12/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/12/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/12/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/12/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 03/12/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/12/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/14/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/14/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/18/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 03/18/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/21/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 04/08/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 04/10/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/10/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/10/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 04/10/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 04/10/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/10/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/10/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/10/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 04/15/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/15/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/15/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/15/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 04/15/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/15/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 04/15/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/15/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/15/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/15/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/15/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 04/29/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/07/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 05/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/28/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/08/2019 Referred to

As of 05/21/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1454 - COOL OFF Act.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.