There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Marijuana Justice Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to provide for a new rule regarding the application of the Act to marihuana, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
04/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/27/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/19/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/28/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/28/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/28/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/05/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/05/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/05/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/05/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 04/15/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 04/15/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/30/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/09/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/20/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/20/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 06/20/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 09/10/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/26/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/17/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/17/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/17/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/17/2019

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/28/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/08/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/28/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/01/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture02/28/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry03/27/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/28/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands03/19/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services02/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1456. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/2019)

Marijuana Justice Act of 2019

This bill decriminalizes marijuana.

Specifically, it removes marijuana from the list of scheduled substances under the Controlled Substances Act and eliminates criminal penalties for an individual who imports, exports, manufactures, distributes, or possesses with intent to distribute marijuana.

Additionally, the bill does the following:

  • reduces federal funds for a state that has not legalized marijuana and has a disproportionate arrest rate or a disproportionate incarceration rate for marijuana offenses,
  • directs federal courts to expunge convictions for marijuana use or possession, and
  • establishes a fund—the Community Reinvestment Fund—to support grants in communities most affected by the war on drugs.