There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protecting Consumer Access to Generic Drugs Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Consumer Access to Generic Drugs Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit brand name drug manufacturers from compensating generic drug manufacturers to delay the entry of a generic drug into the market, and to prohibit biological product manufacturers from compensating biosimilar and interchangeable product manufacturers to delay entry of biosimilar and interchangeable products, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/10/2019Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
05/10/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-52, Part I.
03/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
05/10/2019Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2019Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-52, Part I.
04/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/03/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/03/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/27/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
03/27/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
03/06/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/26/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/26/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 03/26/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 03/26/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/26/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/26/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/27/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 04/01/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/01/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/03/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/04/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 04/04/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/08/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/08/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/09/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/09/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 04/15/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 04/15/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 04/15/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/25/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 04/25/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/25/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/29/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/29/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 04/29/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 05/01/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 05/01/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/07/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 05/07/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 05/07/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/07/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 05/07/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 05/07/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/09/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/09/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 05/09/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/05/2019 Referred to
04/03/2019 Markup by
05/10/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-52
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/06/2019 Referred to
03/27/2019 Markup by
03/27/2019 Reported by
House Judiciary03/05/2019 Referred to
05/10/2019 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law04/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.