There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (13)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

GREAT Act
Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2019

Other Short Titles

GREAT Act
Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

GREAT Act
Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

GREAT Act
Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

GREAT Act
Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

GREAT Act
Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modernize Federal grant reporting, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/30/2019Became Public Law No: 116-103. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2019Signed by President.
12/19/2019Presented to President.
12/16/2019Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10295-10297)
10/21/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5927-5928)
09/10/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-96.
01/17/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 41).
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/30/2019Became Public Law No: 116-103. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2019Signed by President.
12/19/2019HousePresented to President.
12/16/2019-5:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2019-5:09pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10295-10297)
12/16/2019-4:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 150.
12/16/2019-4:58pmHouseMr. Gomez moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10295-10298)
10/22/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/21/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5927-5928)
09/10/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 200.
09/10/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-96.
06/19/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/18/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
01/17/2019-10:40amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/17/2019-10:40amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 41).
01/17/2019-10:32amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H688-689)
01/15/2019-1:57pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/15/2019-1:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 150.
01/15/2019-1:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H569-572; text: CR H569-571)
01/15/2019-1:44pmHouseMr. Cummings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/03/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
01/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform01/03/2019 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/18/2019 Referred to
06/19/2019 Markup by
09/10/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-96

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for H.R.150. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-103 (12/30/2019)

Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2019 or the GREAT Act

This bill requires the establishment and use of data standards for information reported by recipients of federal grants.

The bill requires the Office of Management and Budget, jointly with the executive department that issues the most federal grant awards, to (1) establish government-wide data standards for information reported by grant recipients, (2) issue guidance directing federal agencies to apply those standards, and (3) require the publication of recipient-reported data collected from all agencies on a single public website.

Each agency shall ensure its awards use the data standards for future information collection requests.