There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Bicycle Commuter Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify employer-provided fringe benefits for bicycle commuting.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/05/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E246)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/18/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/18/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/18/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/21/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/21/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/25/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/01/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/03/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 04/18/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 04/22/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/29/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/29/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/30/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/07/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/16/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 05/21/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/04/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/24/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/26/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/28/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/05/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/05/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/05/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/05/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/09/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/04/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 10/15/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 11/08/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 12/06/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/11/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/18/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 06/18/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 06/18/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/22/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/26/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/05/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1507. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/05/2019)

Bicycle Commuter Act of 2019

This bill modifies provisions relating to the tax exclusion for employer-provided fringe benefits for bicycle commuting. Specifically, the bill (1) repeals the suspension (for the period between 2018 and the end of 2025) of the exclusion, (2) includes bikeshare (a bicycle rental operation providing for pick up and drop off) and low-speed electric bicycle within the definition of bicycle for purposes of the exclusion, and (3) modifies the limitation on the exclusion to provide for a specified monthly limitation amount (i.e., 20% of the parking fringe benefit amount).