There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

EMPOWER Act
Ending the Monopoly of Power Over Workplace harassment through Education and Reporting Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To deter, prevent, reduce, and respond to harassment in the workplace, including sexual harassment, sexual assault, and harassment based on protected categories; and to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify the tax treatment of amounts related to employment discrimination and harassment in the workplace, including sexual harassment, sexual assault, and harassment based on protected categories.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
04/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/05/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/05/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 03/05/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/08/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/03/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/03/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/03/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 04/18/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/18/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 04/25/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/06/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 06/13/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/30/2019

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/05/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/05/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services03/05/2019 Referred to
House Administration03/05/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform03/05/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary03/05/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties04/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.