There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Employee Paid Leave Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that 12 weeks of family leave made available to a Federal employee shall be paid leave, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 03/05/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/06/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 03/06/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/06/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/06/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/06/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/07/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/07/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/11/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 03/11/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/18/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/18/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/21/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/21/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/25/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/01/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/09/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/09/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/12/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/12/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/08/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 05/08/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/17/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/03/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/13/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/18/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 06/19/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 06/20/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/27/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 07/09/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/10/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/10/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 07/23/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 09/11/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/11/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 09/12/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform03/05/2019 Referred to
Committee on House Administration03/05/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1534. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/05/2019)

Federal Employee Paid Leave Act

This bill provides paid family leave for certain federal employees in all instances covered by the Family and Medical Leave Act, which currently only guarantees unpaid leave for such instances.

Specifically, the bill requires that the 12 weeks of administrative leave to which certain federal employees are entitled for family care be paid leave. This applies to all federal employees in the competitive service (all civilian positions in the executive branch, all positions in the legislative and judicial branches, and all positions in the government of the District of Columbia), congressional employees, Government Accountability Office employees, employees who are members of the National Guard or Reserves, and certain Transportation Security Administration employees.

The Office of Personnel Management is authorized to increase the amount of paid parental leave available to such employees to a total of 16 administrative work weeks.