There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the inclusion of certain fringe benefit expenses for which a deduction is disallowed in unrelated business taxable income.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/05/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 03/06/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/06/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 03/11/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/11/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 03/11/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/14/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 03/25/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/25/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 03/25/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 04/02/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 04/02/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 04/03/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 04/03/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 04/08/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 04/29/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 04/29/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 04/29/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/29/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 05/01/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 05/01/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/04/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/09/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/09/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/09/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/09/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 07/09/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 09/20/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 10/18/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/08/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/05/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1545. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/05/2019)

This bill modifies the requirements for determining the unrelated business taxable income of tax-exempt organizations. The bill repeals a provision that requires unrelated business taxable income to be increased by the amount of expenses paid or incurred by a tax-exempt organization for certain fringe benefits for which a tax deduction is not allowed, including benefits relating to transportation, parking, or an on-premises athletic facility.