There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

For the relief of Maria Carmen Castro Ramirez and J. Refugio Carreno Rojas.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/11/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
05/22/2020Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-423.
03/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/11/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
06/11/2020-9:02amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/11/2020-9:02amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2379-2380)
06/11/2020-9:02amHouseWithout objection, the Chair laid before the House H.R. 1548. (consideration: CR H2379-2380)
05/22/2020HousePlaced on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 1.
05/22/2020HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-423.
03/11/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/11/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/10/2020HouseSubcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Discharged.
03/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/05/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/05/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/05/2019 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
05/22/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-423
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship03/25/2019 Referred to
03/10/2020 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary06/11/2020 Referred to

As of 08/03/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1548 - For the relief of Maria Carmen Castro Ramirez and J. Refugio Carreno Rojas.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1548. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (06/11/2020)

Provides for the relief of Maria Carmen Castro Ramirez and J. Refugio Carreno Rojas.