There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Hearing Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to remove silencers from the definition of firearms, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
01/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 01/08/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 01/08/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 01/08/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 01/08/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/08/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/08/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/08/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 01/08/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 01/08/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 01/08/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 01/08/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 01/08/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 01/08/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 01/08/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/10/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 01/10/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 01/10/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/10/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 01/11/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/17/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/22/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/22/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 01/23/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/23/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/23/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/24/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/07/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/07/2019
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/07/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 02/11/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 02/25/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/28/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/08/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 03/11/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 03/13/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 03/25/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/15/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 04/15/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/29/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/29/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/21/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 10/22/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/30/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 11/20/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 01/09/2020
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 02/05/2020
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 05/27/2020
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 05/27/2020
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 06/29/2020
Rep. Tiffany, Thomas P. [R-WI-7] 07/20/2020
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/30/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means01/03/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary01/03/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security01/03/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.155. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

Hearing Protection Act

This bill removes silencers from the definition of firearms for purposes of the National Firearms Act. It also treats persons acquiring or possessing a firearm silencer as meeting any registration and licensing requirements of such Act.

The Department of Justice must destroy certain records relating to the registration, transfer, or making of a silencer.

The bill also revises the definition of firearm silencer and firearm muffler under the federal criminal code and includes such items in the 10% excise tax category.