There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Student Right to Know Before You Go Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a new higher education data system to allow for more accurate, complete, and secure data on student retention, graduation, and earnings outcomes, at all levels of postsecondary enrollment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/29/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/07/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/12/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 04/08/2019

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/06/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services03/06/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel03/07/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs03/06/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity03/29/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/06/2019 Referred to

As of 02/16/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1565 - Student Right to Know Before You Go Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1565. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/06/2019)

Student Right to Know Before You Go Act of 2019

This bill requires the National Center for Education Statistics to establish and maintain a new higher education data system. The Center must use the system to calculate student education, debt-related, and earning metrics (e.g., student graduation rates, transfer rates, rates of continuation to subsequent levels of education, dropout rates, loan debt amounts, loan repayment rates, and debt-to-earnings ratios) for each institution of higher education (IHE) that participates in federal student aid programs. The metrics must be disaggregated and separately provided on the basis of specified categories.

The system must meet requirements for minimizing privacy and security risks.

The bill provides for the transition from the existing Integrated Postsecondary Education Data System to the new higher education data system.

The Department of Education (ED) must publish the metrics and post the metrics on its website. Within five years, an IHE that participates in federal student aid programs must display links on its website to ED's website that provides metrics data.