There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SAVE Right Whales Act
Scientific Assistance for Very Endangered North Atlantic Right Whales Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To assist in the conservation of the North Atlantic right whale by supporting and providing financial resources for North Atlantic right whale conservation programs and projects of persons with expertise required for the conservation of North Atlantic right whales, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
05/01/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 13.
05/01/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/01/2019Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
03/26/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
03/22/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/13/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/13/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/04/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/04/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 04/04/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/04/2019
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/04/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/04/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/04/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 04/04/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/07/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/07/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/07/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 05/07/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/07/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 05/07/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/07/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/08/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/10/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 06/11/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 06/11/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/11/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/11/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 06/11/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 06/11/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/11/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/11/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/11/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/11/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/11/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/11/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/18/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 06/18/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/06/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife03/22/2019 Referred to
03/26/2019 Hearings by
05/01/2019 Discharged from
House Budget03/06/2019 Referred to

As of 06/25/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1568 - SAVE Right Whales Act.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.